This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/17/2022 at 09:44:45 (UTC).

Krikor vs WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Krikor filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Krikor, Chris S

Defendants

GMG Motors Inc

WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mobasseri, Robert B

1055 W 7Th St #2140

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

Sidran, David Robert

Attorney at SIDRAN LAW CORP

2010 Crow Canyon Pl Suite 100

San Ramon, CA 94583

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Krikor, Chris S. Refers to: GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Krikor, Chris S. Refers to: GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Krikor, Chris S. Refers to: GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Krikor, Chris S rejected on 08/24/2022.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Krikor, Chris S.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Krikor, Chris S.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.; Filed By: GMG Motors Inc (Defendant); WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.; Filed By: GMG Motors Inc (Defendant); WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Krikor, Chris S.; Filed By: Krikor, Chris S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Krikor, Chris S.; Filed By: Krikor, Chris S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Krikor, Chris S rejected on 08/24/2022.; Filed By: Krikor, Chris S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Krikor, Chris S. Refers to: GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: Krikor, Chris S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Krikor, Chris S. Refers to: GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: Krikor, Chris S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Krikor, Chris S. Refers to: GMG Motors Inc; WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: Krikor, Chris S (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GMG MOTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Westchester Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBASSERI ROBERT B.