This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 09:15:26 (UTC).

Kranz vs Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Kranz filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kranz, Kenneth

Kranz, Lucinda

Defendants

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Alfa Laval Inc

Armstrong International Inc

Blackmer Pump Company

CLA VAL CO

Cameron International Corporation; FKA : Cooper Cameron Corporation

Crane Co

Elliott Company; FKA : Elliott Turbomachinery Company;DBA : Elliott Turbomachinery Company

FMC Corporation

Flowserve US Inc

Gardner Denver Inc

General Electric Company

Hopeman Brothers Inc

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated; FKA : Northrop Grumman Ship Systems

Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc; FKA : Northrop Grumman Ship Systems

IMO Industries Inc

JT Thorpe & Son Inc

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Purdy, Stuart

3760 Kilroy Airport Way Suite 680

Long Beach, CA 90806

Defendant Attorneys

Stewart, Gilliam

Cunningham, James P

LISTER, JOHN R

SCHATZ, RUSSELL

Micaraset, Andrew

Cross, E Reno

500 Washington St Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bailey, Bobbie R

550 S Hope Street 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Khare, Viiu Spangler

Barber, Steven J

U.S. Bank Tower, 633 W 5Th St #1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Karren, Brent M

Davis, Geoffrey M

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Foley, Patrick J

633 W 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Milbrodt, Jeremy

Bray, Kendra Elyse

19900 Macarthur Boulevard 1150

Irvine, CA 92612

Adabale, Esther Lola

633 W 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GREENSLADE, JOSEPH L

Bergstrom, Emily D.

5900 Hollis St Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearance (Notices)

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Cameron International Corporation.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by JT Thorpe & Son Inc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Redco Corporation.

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Gardner Denver Inc.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (OF ESTHER LOLA ADABALE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO MOTION TO QUASH) filed by Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation.

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination filed by Kranz, Kenneth; Kranz, Lucinda.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Not Entered) filed by Kranz, Kenneth; Kranz, Lucinda. Refers to: Unisys Corporation

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Not Entered) filed by Kranz, Kenneth; Kranz, Lucinda. Refers to: Alfa Laval Inc

DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATIONS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Demand for Jury Trial (and Estimate of Length of Trial) filed by FMC Corporation.

DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO COORDINATE ADD ON CASE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.544

Request - Other (to Coordinate Add-On Case Pursuant to CRC 3.544) filed by FMC Corporation.

DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ? ASBESTOS

Answer filed by FMC Corporation.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Blackmer Pump Company.

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Warren Pumps LLC.

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by JT Thorpe & Son Inc.; Filed By: JT Thorpe & Son Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.; Filed By: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by Cameron International Corporation.; Filed By: Cameron International Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Redco Corporation.; Filed By: Redco Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.; Filed By: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Gardner Denver Inc.; Filed By: Gardner Denver Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Petition for Coordination filed by Kranz, Kenneth; Kranz, Lucinda.; Filed By: Kranz, Kenneth (Plaintiff); Kranz, Lucinda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF ESTHER LOLA ADABALE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO MOTION TO QUASH) filed by Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation.; Filed By: Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kranz, Kenneth; Kranz, Lucinda.; Filed By: Kranz, Kenneth (Plaintiff); Kranz, Lucinda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kranz, Kenneth; Kranz, Lucinda. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Alfa Laval Inc; Armstrong International Inc; Blackmer Pump Company; Cameron International Corporation; CLA VAL CO; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Flowserve US Inc; FMC Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Hopeman Brothers Inc; Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc; Huntington Ingalls Incorporated; IMO Industries Inc; JT Thorpe & Son Inc; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; Paramount Global; Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation; Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc; Taco Inc; Union Carbide Corporation; Unisys Corporation; Velan Valve Corp; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps LLC; Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc; The William Powell Company; Filed By: Kranz, Kenneth (Plaintiff); Kranz, Lucinda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kranz, Kenneth; Kranz, Lucinda. Refers to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; Alfa Laval Inc; Armstrong International Inc; Blackmer Pump Company; Cameron International Corporation; CLA VAL CO; Crane Co; Elliott Company; Flowserve US Inc; FMC Corporation; Gardner Denver Inc; General Electric Company; The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Hopeman Brothers Inc; Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc; Huntington Ingalls Incorporated; IMO Industries Inc; JT Thorpe & Son Inc; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; Paramount Global; Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation; Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc; Taco Inc; Union Carbide Corporation; Unisys Corporation; Velan Valve Corp; VIAD Corp; Warren Pumps LLC; Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc; The William Powell Company; Cameron International Corporation; Valves and Controls US Inc; Velan Valve Corp; Redco Corporation; Filed By: Kranz, Kenneth (Plaintiff); Kranz, Lucinda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JT THORPE & SON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant