This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 12:05:34 (UTC).

Kosakoff vs Beach Village Villas LLC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Kosakoff filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Beach Village Villas LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOSAKOFF, JOEL

MCMENAMIN, SARA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BATTER KAY ASSOCIATES

BEACH VILLAGE VILLAS LLC

RE HUGHES CONSTRUCTION INC

Batter Kay Associates Inc; AKA : Batter Kay Associates

The Don Smith Company; DBA : A & A Glass and Mirror

Batter, Michael

Eric Johnson Roof Systems Inc

Dillon Waterproofing Inc

Doug Clowers Concrete

The Don Smith Company

Premier Construction

M-K Construction

Hal Larsen Construction

Doug Clowers; DBA : Doug Clowers Concrete;ESA : Doug Clowers Concrete

Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc

Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential lnc

WICR Waterproofing and Construction Inc

WICR Services Incorporated

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSHOK, COLIN H

One America Plaza, 600 West Broadway #1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SPANGLER, ARIE

Attorney at THE JON CORN LAW FIRM

160 Chesterfield Drive 201

Cardiff, CA 92007

O'Brien, Jillisa L

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JILLISA L O BRIEN

5 Corporate Park 260

Irvine, CA 92606

Hazen, Tyler E

Konoske, Gregory P

Pion-Goureau, Amanda E

1 Macarthur Place 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

ADAMS, CATHERINE M

Attorney at MENEKSHE LAW FIRM

Fischer, Temre L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE COHEN

GRIFFIN, JOHN T

1851 E First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Other Attorneys

Skane, Elizabeth A

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

 

Court Documents

RECOMMENDATION AND [proposed] ORDER REGARDING: THIRD AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TIMELINE; SUMMARY OF DEADLINES AND CASE DATES; AND TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee submitted by RE Hughes Construction Inc received but not filed on 08/12/2020.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 03/26/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 03/19/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Answer

Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee (Recommendation and Order Regarding Second Amendment to CMO timeline; Summary of Deadlines and Case Dates; And Trial Continuance - (SIGNED AS MODIFIED)) filed by CLARKE, AL.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service (ROA 96) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Dillon Waterproofing Inc.

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Notice - Other (of Entry of Order) filed by RE Hughes Construction Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 12/04/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by RE Hughes Construction Inc.

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRecommendation and Order of Discovery Referee submitted by RE Hughes Construction Inc received but not filed on 08/12/2020. Filed By: RE Hughes Construction Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Dillon Waterproofing Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) date was restored to 09/25/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 12/04/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/04/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Entry of Order) filed by RE Hughes Construction Inc. Filed By: RE Hughes Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Dillon Waterproofing Inc. Filed By: Dillon Waterproofing Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Kosakoff, Joel; McMenamin, Sara. Refers to: Batter Kay Associates Inc; Beach Village Villas LLC Filed By: Kosakoff, Joel (Plaintiff); McMenamin, Sara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Kosakoff, Joel; McMenamin, Sara. Refers to: RE Hughes Construction Inc Filed By: Kosakoff, Joel (Plaintiff); McMenamin, Sara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Batter Kay Associates; Beach Village Villas LLC; Batter, Michael. Filed By: Batter Kay Associates Inc (Defendant); Beach Village Villas LLC (Defendant); Batter, Michael (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kosakoff, Joel; McMenamin, Sara. Refers to: Beach Village Villas LLC; Batter Kay Associates Inc; RE Hughes Construction Inc Filed By: Kosakoff, Joel (Plaintiff); McMenamin, Sara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kosakoff, Joel; McMenamin, Sara. Refers to: Beach Village Villas LLC; Batter Kay Associates Inc; RE Hughes Construction Inc Filed By: Kosakoff, Joel (Plaintiff); McMenamin, Sara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kosakoff, Joel; McMenamin, Sara. Refers to: Beach Village Villas LLC; Batter Kay Associates Inc; RE Hughes Construction Inc Filed By: Kosakoff, Joel (Plaintiff); McMenamin, Sara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Don Smith Company is a litigant