This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 08:31:59 (UTC).

Komazec vs Legoland California LLC

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Komazec filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Legoland California LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Komazec, Ayden

Defendants

Legoland California LLC

Legoland California Resort LLC; ESA : Legoland California LLC

Guardian Ad Litem

Music, Almina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roberts, Malcolm

Attorney at LANDAY ROBERTS LLP

600 W Broadway 700

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie S

Attorney at BORTON PETRINI LLP

626 Wilshire Blvd Suite 975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record (Granted 05/20/21) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California LLC

Summons

Original Summons filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California LLC

Complaint For Damages

Complaint filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California LLC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC

Notice of Ruling (Notices)

Notice of Ruling filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/22/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Komazec, Ayden.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Komazec, Ayden.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Legoland California Resort LLC. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketJury demanded by Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/22/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Komazec, Ayden. Filed By: Komazec, Ayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Komazec, Ayden. Filed By: Komazec, Ayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Legoland California Resort LLC. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (Granted 05/20/21) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Komazec, Ayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Komazec, Ayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Komazec, Ayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Komazec, Ayden. Refers to: Music, Almina; Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Komazec, Ayden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO