This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 06:15:55 (UTC).

Knutson vs Fuller Ford

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Knutson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Fuller Ford. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY

Knutson, Thomas J

Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith

Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy

Defendants

Fuller Ford

Ford Motor Company

CV Auto Group Inc; DBA : Ford Chula Vista

Michelin North America Inc

Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; ESA : Discount Tire Co Inc;DBA : America's Tire

Guardian Ad Litem

Bostrom, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Chambers II, Robert J

Shea, Adam K

Defendant Attorneys

Hansen, David

Yukevich, James J

Kohn, Andrew N

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Transmittal and Notice of Receipt of Transferred Case SD

Case file contents transferred to receiving court SHASTA pursuant to court order.

Returned Mail

Returned Mail (Notice of Signing of an Order Re Change of Venue and Requet for Payment of Fees) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Shea, Adam

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/04/2022 10:30:00 AM.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Candace Khorouzan - CSR# 11579) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Declaration of Daniel S. Rodman in Support of Defendants Ford Motor Company, Fuller Ford, and Chula Vista Ford's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to Shasta County

Declaration - Other filed by CV Auto Group Inc; Ford Motor Company; Fuller Ford.

Supplemental Declaration of David P. Hansen in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company, Fuller Ford, and Chula Vista Ford's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to Shasta County

Declaration - Other filed by CV Auto Group Inc; Ford Motor Company; Fuller Ford.

Defendant Ford Motor Company, Fuller Ford, and Chula Vista Ford's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to Shasta County

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by CV Auto Group Inc; Ford Motor Company; Fuller Ford.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY; Knutson, Thomas J; Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith; Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy.

Notice of Change of Firm Name (Participant Information)

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (for Order Directing the Coroner to Release Copies of Photographs of Decedent and Order) filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY; Knutson, Thomas J; Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith; Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy; Michelin North America Inc; Fuller Ford; Ford Motor Company; CV Auto Group Inc; Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY.

Opposition - Other (Opposition & Replies)

Opposition - Other filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/04/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Michelin North America Inc.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY.

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase file contents transferred to receiving court SHASTA pursuant to court order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail (Notice of Signing of an Order Re Change of Venue and Requet for Payment of Fees) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Shea, Adam

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/04/2022 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 10:00AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Candace Khorouzan - CSR# 11579) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by CV Auto Group Inc; Ford Motor Company; Fuller Ford.; Filed By: CV Auto Group Inc (Defendant); Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Fuller Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by CV Auto Group Inc; Ford Motor Company; Fuller Ford.; Filed By: CV Auto Group Inc (Defendant); Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Fuller Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY; Knutson, Thomas J; Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith; Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy; Bostrom, David. Refers to: Fuller Ford; Filed By: KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY (Plaintiff); Knutson, Thomas J (Plaintiff); Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith (Plaintiff); Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy (Plaintiff); Bostrom, David (Guardian Ad Litem)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY; Knutson, Thomas J; Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith; Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy; Bostrom, David. Refers to: Fuller Ford; CV Auto Group Inc; Michelin North America Inc; Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; Ford Motor Company; Filed By: KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY (Plaintiff); Knutson, Thomas J (Plaintiff); Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith (Plaintiff); Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy (Plaintiff); Bostrom, David (Guardian Ad Litem)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY; Chambers II, Robert J. Refers to: Fuller Ford; Filed By: KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY (Plaintiff); Chambers II, Robert J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY; Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy; Knutson, Thomas J; Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith. Refers to: Fuller Ford; Filed By: KNUTSON, MARYANN MARGARET TRINITY (Plaintiff); Knutson, Whitney Ellen Joy (Plaintiff); Knutson, Thomas J (Plaintiff); Knutson, Trinity Meadow Faith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less