This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 04:01:03 (UTC).

Knox Attorney Service Inc vs Yesnik

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Knox Attorney Service Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Yesnik. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Knox Attorney Service Inc

Defendant

Yesnick, Charles

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Fictitious Business Name Declaration

Fictitious Business Name Declaration filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Yesnick, Charles

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Yesnick, Charles

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Yesnick, Charles

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: 1104; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 07/21/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 1104 before at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 07/21/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 1104 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 1104 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Yesnick, Charles Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Yesnick, Charles Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Yesnick, Charles Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNOX ATTORNEY SERVICE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant