This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 04:00:35 (UTC).

Knox Attorney Service Inc vs Downtown LA Law Group

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Knox Attorney Service Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Downtown LA Law Group. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Knox Attorney Service Inc

Defendant

Downtown LA Law Group

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Fictitious Business Name Declaration

Fictitious Business Name Declaration filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed with prejudice as to Downtown LA Law Group.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed with prejudice as to Knox Attorney Service Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 1104 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 1104 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration filed by Knox Attorney Service Inc. Refers to: Downtown LA Law Group Filed By: Knox Attorney Service Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNOX ATTORNEY SERVICE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWNTOWN LA LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant