This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 18:16:12 (UTC).

Kliber vs. Salz

Case Summary

On 10/24/2014 Kliber filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Salz. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************P-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kliber, Matthew

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Hasler, John

Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust

Keene, Earl

Roos, Bernard Willem

Salz, Jennifer

Hasler, John ; DBA : Hasler Construction Company

Roos, Bernard A

KEENE, EARL ; DBA : CUTTING EDGE TREE SERVICE

ROOS, BERNARD A; ESA : ROOS, BERNARD WILLEM

MALONE TILE DESIGN INC

MALONE, JIM

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Hasler, John ; DBA : Hasler Construction Company

KEENE, EARL ; DBA : CUTTING EDGE TREE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FUHRMAN, WILLIAM R

527 Encinitas Blvd #202

Encinitas, CA 92024

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

REYNOLDS, JAMES

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES REYNOLDS

12636 High Bluff Dr 400

San Diego, CA 92130

ROSENBERG, DAVID

Attorney at ROSENBERG SHPALL & ZEIGEN

750 B Street 3210

San Diego, CA 92101

BREW, SEAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SEAN BREW

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

SCHLUEDERBERG, PETER Q

Attorney at WALTON LAW FIRM

250 Via Vera Cruz

San Marcos, CA 92078

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENBERG, DAVID

Attorney at ROSENBERG SHPALL & ZEIGEN

750 B Street 3210

San Diego, CA 92101

BREW, SEAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SEAN BREW

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order (5/11/16) filed by Kliber, Matthew.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (5/11/16) filed by Kliber, Matthew.

Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine (DEFENDANT'S 1-2) filed by Keene, Earl.

Notice of Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine (#1) filed by Roos, Bernard A; Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust.

Trial Brief

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Opposition to Motion in Limine

Opposition to Motion in Limine (06/03/16) filed by Kliber, Matthew.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (1st Amended Complaint & Summons) filed by Kliber, Matthew. Refers to: Hasler, John

Answer filed by Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust.

Answer filed by Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust. Refers to: Kliber, Matthew

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request - Other (REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT) submitted by Kliber, Matthew rejected on 02/04/2015. Refers to: Keene, Earl

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (DEFECTIVE-PARTY SERVED IS NOT A PARTY TO THE ACTION) filed by Kliber, Matthew.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 07/17/2015 at 09:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Answer

Answer filed by Keene, Earl. Refers to: Kliber, Matthew

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Salz, Jennifer.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kliber, Matthew. Refers to: Malone Tile Design Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Roos, Bernard A.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 03/04/2016 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request - Other (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL REJECTED) submitted by Roos, Bernard A rejected on 01/06/2016.

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Kliber, Matthew .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hasler, John .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Keene, Earl .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Roos, Bernard A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Salz, Jennifer .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hasler, John .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Roos, Bernard A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Salz, Jennifer .

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (TO COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED PRIOR TO ANSWER)) filed by Hasler, John. Filed By: Hasler, John (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint filed by Kliber, Matthew.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Kliber, Matthew. Refers to: Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust; Salz, Jennifer; Roos, Bernard; Keene, Earl; Hasler, John Filed By: Kliber, Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kliber, Matthew. Refers to: Salz, Jennifer Filed By: Kliber, Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Kliber, Matthew. Refers to: Salz, Jennifer Filed By: Kliber, Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Kliber, Matthew. Refers to: Salz, Jennifer; Jennifer Salz, as trustee of the Jennifer B. Salz Living Trust; Roos, Bernard; Keene, Earl; Hasler, John Filed By: Kliber, Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.