This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 05:17:57 (UTC).

Kleege vs McGinty

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Kleege filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against McGinty. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Randa Trapp and Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Randa Trapp

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kleege, Robert Bruce; DBA : Kleege Enterprises

Summer Creek 640 L P

Defendants

Or-Cal Cabinets LLC

Perez, Dana

McGinty, Thomas

Aycock, Terry

Espinoza, Abraham

Bolanos, Jose Luis

Imperia Enterprises LLC

Ealy, Cory

Imperia Group, LLC

McGinty, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neal, Todd

Renda, Vincent

Attorney at PINNACLE LEGAL PC

9565 Waples Street 200

San Diego, CA 92121

Defendant Attorney

Learned, Matthew B

408 Nutmeg St

San Diego, CA 92103

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bolanos, Jose Luis; Or-Cal Cabinets LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Bolanos, Jose Luis; Or-Cal Cabinets LLC.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Notice of Change Firm Name) filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P. Refers to: McGinty, Paul; Ealy, Cory

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/18/2021 10:15:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Substitution of Attorney submitted by McGinty, Thomas rejected on 03/01/2021.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by McGinty, Thomas.

Notice of Hearing SD

Informal Discovery Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 1603 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by McGinty, Thomas.

Ex Parte Application and Order

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by McGinty, Thomas.

Declaration of Sharlynne Solomon in Support of Ex Parte Application to Meet and Confer Regarding Stay of the Deposition of Defendant Thomas McGinty

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by McGinty, Thomas.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by McGinty, Thomas.

Opposition to Ex Parte Application

Opposition - Other (Opposition to Ex Parte) filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P.

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by McGinty, Thomas. Filed By: McGinty, Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by McGinty, Thomas. Filed By: McGinty, Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 10:30AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/06/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (relief and order) filed by McGinty, Thomas. Filed By: McGinty, Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Sharlynne Solomon in support of ex parte) filed by McGinty, Thomas. Filed By: McGinty, Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (ex parte, declaration) filed by McGinty, Thomas. Filed By: McGinty, Thomas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P. Refers to: Or-Cal Cabinets LLC Filed By: Kleege, Robert Bruce (Plaintiff); Summer Creek 640 L P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kleege, Robert Bruce; Summer Creek 640 L P. Refers to: Imperia Group, LLC Filed By: Kleege, Robert Bruce (Plaintiff); Summer Creek 640 L P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 10:10:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Summer Creek 640 L P; Kleege, Robert Bruce. Refers to: McGinty, Thomas; Imperia Enterprises LLC; Imperia Group, LLC; McGinty, Paul; Perez, Dana; Bolanos, Jose; Or-Cal Cabinets LLC; Espinoza, Abraham; Ealy, Cory; Aycock, Terry Filed By: Summer Creek 640 L P (Plaintiff); Kleege, Robert Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Summer Creek 640 L P; Kleege, Robert Bruce. Refers to: McGinty, Thomas; Imperia Enterprises LLC; Imperia Group, LLC; McGinty, Paul; Perez, Dana; Bolanos, Jose; Or-Cal Cabinets LLC; Espinoza, Abraham; Ealy, Cory; Aycock, Terry Filed By: Summer Creek 640 L P (Plaintiff); Kleege, Robert Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Summer Creek 640 L P; Kleege, Robert Bruce. Refers to: McGinty, Thomas; Imperia Enterprises LLC; Imperia Group, LLC; McGinty, Paul; Perez, Dana; Bolanos, Jose; Or-Cal Cabinets LLC; Espinoza, Abraham; Ealy, Cory; Aycock, Terry Filed By: Summer Creek 640 L P (Plaintiff); Kleege, Robert Bruce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal, Todd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Renda, Vincent