This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/21/2020 at 01:20:12 (UTC).

Kirklen Vs Mini Cooper of Escondido

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 Kirklen filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mini Cooper of Escondido. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirklen, Jeane

Defendants

Mini Cooper of Escondido

Brecht Enterprises Inc; DBA : Mini of Escondido

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Kirklen, Jeane.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Mini Cooper of Escondido

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Mini Cooper of Escondido

Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Mini Cooper of Escondido; Brecht Enterprises Inc

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Brecht Enterprises Inc

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/23/2019 01:00:00 PM.

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Brecht Enterprises Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketThe Court finds judgment on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court(FIRST AMENDED) for Brecht Enterprises Inc, DBA Mini of Escondido and against Jeane Kirklen in the amount of: $0 principal, $0 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/23/2019 01:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Brecht Enterprises Inc. Filed By: Brecht Enterprises Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: Kirklen, Jeane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Mini Cooper of Escondido.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Mini Cooper of Escondido; Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: Kirklen, Jeane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Mini Cooper of Escondido Filed By: Kirklen, Jeane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 09/23/2019 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Filed By: Kirklen, Jeane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Refers to: Mini Cooper of Escondido Filed By: Kirklen, Jeane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Kirklen, Jeane. Filed By: Kirklen, Jeane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brecht Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant