This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 05:39:29 (UTC).

Kinsell vs Baines

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Kinsell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Baines. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kinsell, Jonah Blake

Defendants

Baines, Mark

Baines, Rosalina Mercedes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATALE, SILVIO

13144 Prairie Ave

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Defendant Attorney

Gibbs, Patrick J

Attorney at FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR One World Trade Center

1 World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-2700

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina; Baines, Mark

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina; Baines, Mark

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina; Baines, Mark

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Mark

Answer

Answer filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Baines, Mark; Baines, Rosalina Mercedes.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/14/2022 09:30:00 AM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/14/2022 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake.; Filed By: Kinsell, Jonah Blake (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Baines, Mark; Baines, Rosalina Mercedes.; Filed By: Baines, Mark (Defendant); Baines, Rosalina Mercedes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.; Filed By: Baines, Rosalina Mercedes (Defendant); Baines, Mark (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.; Filed By: Baines, Rosalina Mercedes (Defendant); Baines, Mark (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.; Filed By: Baines, Rosalina Mercedes (Defendant); Baines, Mark (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Baines, Rosalina Mercedes; Baines, Mark.; Filed By: Baines, Rosalina Mercedes (Defendant); Baines, Mark (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Mark; Filed By: Kinsell, Jonah Blake (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina; Filed By: Kinsell, Jonah Blake (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina; Baines, Mark; Filed By: Kinsell, Jonah Blake (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina; Baines, Mark; Filed By: Kinsell, Jonah Blake (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kinsell, Jonah Blake. Refers to: Baines, Rosalina; Baines, Mark; Filed By: Kinsell, Jonah Blake (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATALE SILVIO LEONARD ESQ.