This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 07:08:07 (UTC).

King vs San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 King filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

King, Aquina

Defendants

San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital

United Nursing International LLC

The County of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Rick

Attorney at ANGEL CITY LAW PC

645 W 9Th St

Los Angeles, CA 90015

Defendant Attorney

Millan, Erik E.

16830 Ventura Blvd Unit 130

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: United Nursing International LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital; United Nursing International LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital; United Nursing International LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital; United Nursing International LLC

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: The County of San Diego

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital ONLY) filed by King, Aquina.

DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer filed by United Nursing International LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by United Nursing International LLC. Filed By: United Nursing International LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital ONLY) filed by King, Aquina. Filed By: King, Aquina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: The County of San Diego Filed By: King, Aquina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: United Nursing International LLC Filed By: King, Aquina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital Filed By: King, Aquina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital; United Nursing International LLC; The County of San Diego Filed By: King, Aquina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital; United Nursing International LLC Filed By: King, Aquina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by King, Aquina. Refers to: San Diego County Psychiatric Hospital; United Nursing International LLC Filed By: King, Aquina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less