This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/16/2021 at 06:01:17 (UTC).

Kilroy Realty LP vs Poe

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Kilroy Realty LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Poe. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kilroy Realty LP

Defendants

Poe, Lindsay M

Van Vuren, David J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALEY, ANDREW J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay; Van Vuren, David

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay; Van Vuren, David

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay; Van Vuren, David

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Van Vuren, David

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay Filed By: Kilroy Realty LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Van Vuren, David Filed By: Kilroy Realty LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/28/2022 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay; Van Vuren, David Filed By: Kilroy Realty LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay; Van Vuren, David Filed By: Kilroy Realty LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kilroy Realty LP. Refers to: Poe, Lindsay; Van Vuren, David Filed By: Kilroy Realty LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KILROY REALTY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALEY ANDREW J.