This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 08:35:48 (UTC).

KILLIAN vs TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 KILLIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Killian, Molly Maverick

Armfield, Stephen

Defendants

Kearney Mesa Toyota

Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc

Toyota Motor Corporation

Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc

Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

KMT/UAG INC; ESA : Kearney Mesa Toyota;DBA : Kearney Mesa Toyota

ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC

TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC

ZF Passive Safety Systems US Inc

ZF North America Inc

ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITSEMA, SCOTT A

Attorney at BISNAR CHASE

Defendant Attorneys

Turner, Vickie E

GALVIN, VINCENT

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING and MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer filed by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc.

Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc.

Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney filed by Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc; KMT/UAG INC.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Amendments)

Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Amendments)

Amendment to Complaint (DOE 2) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF Passive Safety Systems US Inc

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Amendments)

Amendment to Complaint (DOE 3) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Amendments)

Amendment to Complaint (DOE 4) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Amendments)

Amendment to Complaint (DOE 5) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF North America Inc

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other (To Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick; Armfield, Stephen.

DEFENDANT KMT/UAG, INC. D/B/A KEARNY MESA TOYOTA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer filed by KMT/UAG INC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Kearney Mesa Toyota

Complaint

Complaint filed by Killian, Molly Maverick; Armfield, Stephen. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc; Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc; Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc; Kearney Mesa Toyota

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Killian, Molly Maverick; Armfield, Stephen. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc; Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc; Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc; Kearney Mesa Toyota

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 1) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 2) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF Passive Safety Systems US Inc Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 3) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 4) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 5) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: ZF North America Inc Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc; KMT/UAG INC. Filed By: Toyota Motor Corporation (Defendant); Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc (Defendant); KMT/UAG INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc. Filed By: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Killian, Molly Maverick. Refers to: KMT/UAG INC Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Killian, Molly Maverick; Armfield, Stephen. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc; Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc; Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc; KMT/UAG INC; TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC; ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC; ZF North America Inc; ZF Passive Safety Systems US Inc; ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff); Armfield, Stephen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Killian, Molly Maverick; Armfield, Stephen. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc; Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc; Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc; KMT/UAG INC Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff); Armfield, Stephen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Killian, Molly Maverick; Armfield, Stephen. Refers to: Toyota Motor Corporation; Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc; Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America Inc; Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada Inc; KMT/UAG INC Filed By: Killian, Molly Maverick (Plaintiff); Armfield, Stephen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZF NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KMT/UAG INC; DBA : KEARNY MESA TOYOTA;ESA : KMG/UAG INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp is a litigant