This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 00:23:39 (UTC).

Kenyon Plastering of California Inc vs Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Kenyon Plastering of California Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Richard Richard Construction Co Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KENYON PLASTERING OF CALIFORNIA INC

KENYON PLASTERING OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RICHARD & RICHARD CONSTRUCTION CO INC

CREEKSIDE VISTA LLC

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

PARTRIDGE, WILLIAM L

525 Green St

Martinez, CA 94553

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WILKINSON, DAVID E

Attorney at RICHARD & RICHARD CONSTRUCTION CO INC

234 Venture St

San Marcos, CA 92078

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/26/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/05/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/01/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc.

Kenyon Answer to Cross Complaint

Answer filed by Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Suretec Insurance Company.

Answer

Answer filed by Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc.

Complaint

Complaint (Cross Complaint) filed by Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc. Refers to: Kenyon Plastering of California Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed by Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc. Refers to: Kenyon Plastering of California Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Refers to: Suretec Insurance Company

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Refers to: Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc

Proof of Service of Summons by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc.

First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Refers to: Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc; Suretec Insurance Company

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 10]

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/26/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 10/25/2019 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/05/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 07/26/2019 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc. Filed By: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/01/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 04/05/2019 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 10]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Refers to: Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc; Suretec Insurance Company Filed By: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Filed By: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Refers to: Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc; Creekside Vista LLC Filed By: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Refers to: Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc; Creekside Vista LLC Filed By: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Kenyon Plastering of California Inc. Refers to: Richard & Richard Construction Co Inc; Creekside Vista LLC Filed By: Kenyon Plastering of Southern California Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENYON PLASTERING OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RICHARD & RICHARD CONSTRUCTION CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William L Partridge