Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 01:49:57 (UTC).

Kens vs Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Kens filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gutierrez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kens, Norges O

Defendants

Western Surety Company

Ernesto Gutierrez; DBA : The Fine Auto Store

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

Attorney at THE SADR LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorney

ARONSON, MARK E

Attorney at ANDERSON MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

 

Court Documents

Western Surety Company's Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Western Surety Company.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Kens, Norges O. Refers to: Ernesto Gutierrez; Western Surety Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kens, Norges O. Refers to: Ernesto Gutierrez; Western Surety Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Kens, Norges O. Refers to: Ernesto Gutierrez; Western Surety Company

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Kens, Norges O. Refers to: Ernesto Gutierrez; Western Surety Company Filed By: Kens, Norges O (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kens, Norges O. Refers to: Ernesto Gutierrez; Western Surety Company Filed By: Kens, Norges O (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kens, Norges O. Refers to: Ernesto Gutierrez; Western Surety Company Filed By: Kens, Norges O (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARONSON MARK E. ESQ.