This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 06:23:38 (UTC).

Kenneth Leonard vs. Keith Briley

Case Summary

On 04/08/2010 Kenneth Leonard filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Keith Briley. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************N-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEONARD, KENNETH

Defendants

BRILEY SR, KEITH

LAW OFFICES OF KEITH BRILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINGSLEY, MONIQUE N

Attorney at HAINESLAW

139 Third Avenue 108

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 05/13/2011 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 01/31/2011 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/31/2011 at 01:30:00 PM at East County in E-21 .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/19/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Leonard, Kenneth. Filed By: Leonard, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/24/2011 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 05/13/2011 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketCase file location changed to East County Courthouse E-Civil/Small Claims Business Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/24/2011 at 11:00AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial set for 05-27-2011 at 8:30am vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 01/31/2011 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketAnswer filed by Briley, Keith Sr. Filed By: Briley, Keith Sr (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed by Leonard, Kenneth. Refers to: Briley, Keith Filed By: Leonard, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Amended) filed by Leonard, Kenneth. Refers to: Law Offices of Keith Briley Filed By: Leonard, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Leonard, Kenneth. Refers to: Briley, Keith Filed By: Leonard, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Leonard, Kenneth. Refers to: Law Offices of Keith Briley Filed By: Leonard, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Leonard, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Leonard, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Leonard, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less