This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 05:07:29 (UTC).

Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019 vs Haun

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019 filed an Other lawsuit against Haun. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019

Defendants

Davila, Aaron James

Zarcaro, John

Frazier, Jeffrey

Haun, Theodore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, JOHN J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J MURPHY III

3990 Old Town Avenue Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant Attorneys

Thind, Minney

101 W Broadway 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Achtel, Roland H

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER AND MACK LLP

401 W A Street 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Frazier, Jeffrey; Haun, Theodore.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Zarcaro, John.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/19/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Opposition - Other

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in opposition to demurrer) filed by Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Zarcaro, John.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/12/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) filed by Haun, Theodore; Frazier, Jeffrey.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Zarcaro, John.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/28/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Answer

Answer filed by Davila, Aaron James.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Davila, Aaron James.

General Denial

General Denial filed by Frazier, Jeffrey; Haun, Theodore.

Proof of Service Re: General Denial

Proof of Service filed by Frazier, Jeffrey; Haun, Theodore.

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by Zarcaro, John.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer) filed by Zarcaro, John.

Declaration of Ian R. Friedman

Declaration - Other (of Ian R Friedman in support of demurrer) filed by Zarcaro, John.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Davila, Aaron James. Filed By: Davila, Aaron James (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Davila, Aaron James. Filed By: Davila, Aaron James (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 01:30PM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/28/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Zarcaro, John. Filed By: Zarcaro, John (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) filed by Haun, Theodore; Frazier, Jeffrey. Filed By: Haun, Theodore (Defendant); Frazier, Jeffrey (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 05/28/2021 at 10:30AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/12/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/30/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) filed by Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated Decemver 20 2019. Filed By: Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated Decemver 20 2019. Refers to: Haun, Theodore; Frazier, Jeffrey; Zarcaro, John; Davila, Aaron Filed By: Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated Decemver 20 2019. Refers to: Haun, Theodore; Frazier, Jeffrey; Zarcaro, John; Davila, Aaron Filed By: Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated Decemver 20 2019. Refers to: Haun, Theodore; Frazier, Jeffrey; Zarcaro, John; Davila, Aaron Filed By: Kelly A Pagano as Trustee of the Charles P Frazier Living trust dated December 20 2019 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY, JOHN J