Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 01:30:25 (UTC).

Kele Jacques O'Neill vs. Tiana Janee Edison

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Kele Jacques O'Neill filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Tiana Janee Edison. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

O'Neill, Kele Jacques

Respondent

Edison, Tiana Janee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/16/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (of Non-Service) filed by Edison, Tiana Janee. Refers to: O'Neill, Kele; O'Neill, Nathius; O'Neill, Cyrus Filed By: Edison, Tiana Janee (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by Edison, Tiana Janee. Refers to: O'Neill, Kele; O'Neill, Nathius; O'Neill, Cyrus Filed By: Edison, Tiana Janee (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service filed by O'Neill, Kele Jacques. Refers to: Edison, Tiana Filed By: O'Neill, Kele Jacques (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment (RECIEVED) filed by O'Neill, Kele Jacques. Refers to: Edison, Tiana; O'Neill, Nathius; O'Neill, Cyrus Filed By: O'Neill, Kele Jacques (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Edison, Tiana Janee. Refers to: O'Neill, Kele Filed By: Edison, Tiana Janee (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Response) filed by Edison, Tiana Janee. Refers to: O'Neill, Kele Filed By: Edison, Tiana Janee (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by O'Neill, Kele Jacques. Refers to: Edison, Tiana Filed By: O'Neill, Kele Jacques (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by O'Neill, Kele Jacques. Refers to: Edison, Tiana; O'Neill, Nathius; O'Neill, Cyrus Filed By: O'Neill, Kele Jacques (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by O'Neill, Kele Jacques. Refers to: Edison, Tiana; O'Neill, Nathius; O'Neill, Cyrus Filed By: O'Neill, Kele Jacques (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by O'Neill, Kele Jacques. Refers to: Edison, Tiana; O'Neill, Nathius; O'Neill, Cyrus Filed By: O'Neill, Kele Jacques (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 08:20:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less