This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:13:25 (UTC).

Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc vs Clark Construction Group -California LP

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Keenan Hopkins Suder Stowell Contractors Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Clark Construction Group -California LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc

Defendants

Clark Construction Group -California LP

Federal Insurance Company

Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Resurreccion, Trevor O

1100 Town And Country Rd Suite #1450

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP; Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America; Federal Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP; Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America; Federal Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company

Complaint

Complaint filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP; Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America; Federal Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Zurich American Insurance Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Federal Insurance Company

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc.; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc.; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Zurich American Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Federal Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Clark Construction Group -California LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Zurich American Insurance Company; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Federal Insurance Company; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP; Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America; Federal Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP; Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America; Federal Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc. Refers to: Clark Construction Group -California LP; Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America; Federal Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; Filed By: Keenan Hopkins Suder & Stowell Contractors Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEENAN HOPKINS SUDER & STOWELL CONTRACTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP - CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant