This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 06:43:39 (UTC).

Keaveny vs Schindler Elevator Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Keaveny filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Schindler Elevator Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bonato, Jaciara

Keaveny, Olivia Bonato

Defendants

Schindler Elevator Corporation

Simon Property Group Inc

Fashion Valley Mall LLC

Guardian Ad Litem

Keaveny, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evans, Jason C

Attorney at CASEY GERRY SCHENK FRANCAVILLA BLATT & PENFIE

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

RAMSEY, LAWRENCE R

970 W 190Th St #700

Torrance, CA 90502

BALESTRERI, THOMAS A Jr

Attorney at BALESTRERI POTOCKI & HOLMES

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Schindler Elevator Corporations Notice of Hearing Re Pro Hac Vice Applications for Blake Shelby and Kevin Schiferl and Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/28/2022 08:30:00 AM.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation; Simon Property Group Inc.

AMENDED DECLARATION OF BLAKE N. SHELBY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - Other filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.

AMENDED DECLARATION OF KEVIN C. SCHIFERL IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - Other filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.

[PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING ADMISSION OF KEVIN C. SCHIFERL PRO HAC VICE

Proposed Order submitted by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation received but not filed on 08/17/2022.

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF KEVIN C. SCHIFERL AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANTHONY J. PARASCANDOLA, ESQ.

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.

[PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING ADMISSION OF BLAKE N. SHELBY PRO HAC VICE

Proposed Order submitted by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation received but not filed on 08/17/2022.

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF BLAKE N. SHELBY AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANTHONY J. PARASCANDOLA, ESQ.

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.

Substitution of Attorney (Participant Information)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC.

Substitution of Attorney (Participant Information)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.

Association of Attorney (Participant Information)

Association of Attorney filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/28/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

Fashion Valley Mall, LLC's Notice of Errata Regarding Answer to Complaint

Notice of Errata filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation.; Filed By: Schindler Elevator Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/28/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 10:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 09:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketRenewal fee for Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice is due on the anniversary date of this order for each year the case continues.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketRenewal fee for Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice is due on the anniversary date of this order for each year the case continues.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Schindler Elevator Corporation.; Filed By: Fashion Valley Mall LLC (Defendant); Schindler Elevator Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara. Refers to: Simon Property Group Inc; Filed By: Keaveny, Olivia Bonato (Plaintiff); Bonato, Jaciara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara.; Filed By: Keaveny, Olivia Bonato (Plaintiff); Bonato, Jaciara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara. Refers to: Schindler Elevator Corporation; Simon Property Group Inc; Filed By: Keaveny, Olivia Bonato (Plaintiff); Bonato, Jaciara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara. Refers to: Schindler Elevator Corporation; Simon Property Group Inc; Filed By: Keaveny, Olivia Bonato (Plaintiff); Bonato, Jaciara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara. Refers to: Schindler Elevator Corporation; Simon Property Group Inc; Filed By: Keaveny, Olivia Bonato (Plaintiff); Bonato, Jaciara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Keaveny, Olivia Bonato; Bonato, Jaciara. Refers to: Schindler Elevator Corporation; Simon Property Group Inc; Keaveny, Michael; Fashion Valley Mall LLC; Filed By: Keaveny, Olivia Bonato (Plaintiff); Bonato, Jaciara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less