This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:52:01 (UTC).

Kearns vs Toast Catering Inc

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Kearns filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Toast Catering Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Randa Trapp and Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Randa Trapp

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kearns, Christa N

Defendants

Behnam, Kim

Sam Behnam director and officer of Toast Catering Inc

Behnam, Sam

Toast Catering Inc

Kim Behnam director and officer of Toast Caterin Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strauss, David P

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons Complaint - Toast Catering

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Kim Behnam

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Behnam, Kim; Kim Behnam director and officer of Toast Caterin Inc

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Substitute Sam Behnam

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Behnam, Sam; Sam Behnam director and officer of Toast Catering Inc

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Kearns, Christa N.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Ronald Frazier effective 02/25/2020

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/14/2020 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc; Behnam, Sam; Behnam, Kim; Sam Behnam director and officer of Toast Catering Inc; Kim Behnam director and officer of Toast Caterin Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc; Behnam, Sam; Behnam, Kim

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc; Behnam, Sam; Behnam, Kim

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc Filed By: Kearns, Christa N (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Behnam, Kim; Kim Behnam director and officer of Toast Caterin Inc Filed By: Kearns, Christa N (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Behnam, Sam; Sam Behnam director and officer of Toast Catering Inc Filed By: Kearns, Christa N (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2020 at 09:40:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Ronald Frazier effective 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/14/2020 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Kearns, Christa N. Filed By: Kearns, Christa N (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2020 at 09:40:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc; Behnam, Sam; Behnam, Kim; Sam Behnam director and officer of Toast Catering Inc; Kim Behnam director and officer of Toast Caterin Inc Filed By: Kearns, Christa N (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc; Behnam, Sam; Behnam, Kim Filed By: Kearns, Christa N (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kearns, Christa N. Refers to: Toast Catering Inc; Behnam, Sam; Behnam, Kim Filed By: Kearns, Christa N (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.