This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 04:58:55 (UTC).

Kazanchian vs HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Kazanchian filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kazanchian, Arsen

Defendants

Land Rover San Diego

HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mesrobian, Krikor Sarkis

280 S Beverly Dr Ste 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

[A document for ROA# 3]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: Land Rover San Diego

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Kazanchian, Arsen.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Filed By: Kazanchian, Arsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Land Rover San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Kazanchian, Arsen .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: Land Rover San Diego Filed By: Kazanchian, Arsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC Filed By: Kazanchian, Arsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC; Land Rover San Diego Filed By: Kazanchian, Arsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC Filed By: Kazanchian, Arsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kazanchian, Arsen. Refers to: HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC Filed By: Kazanchian, Arsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESROBIAN KRIKOR SARKIS