Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 07:47:07 (UTC).

Katagai vs Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Katagai filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Randa Trapp and Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Randa Trapp

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Katagai, Naomi

Trawalter, Stephane

Trawalter, Emmie

Trawalter, Leo

Defendants

Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust

Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust

Guardian Ad Litem

Tilley, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Thompson, Anthony D

Attorney at THOMPSON INJURY LAW

Defendant Attorney

Phillips, Frederick C

 

Court Documents

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge (Denied) filed by Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust.

General Denial

General Denial filed by Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020

Complaint

Complaint filed by Katagai, Naomi; Trawalter, Stephane; Trawalter, Emmie; Trawalter, Leo. Refers to: Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Katagai, Naomi; Trawalter, Stephane; Trawalter, Emmie; Trawalter, Leo. Refers to: Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (for Leo Trawalter ORDER SIGNED ON 09/08/2020) filed by Tilley, James. Refers to: Trawalter, Leo

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (for Emmie Trawalter ORDER SIGNED 09/08/2020) filed by Tilley, James. Refers to: Trawalter, Emmie

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Katagai, Naomi; Trawalter, Stephane; Trawalter, Emmie; Trawalter, Leo.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (Denied) filed by Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust. Filed By: Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust (Defendant); Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust. Filed By: Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust (Defendant); Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust. Filed By: Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust (Defendant); Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Katagai, Naomi; Trawalter, Stephane; Trawalter, Emmie; Trawalter, Leo. Refers to: Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust Filed By: Katagai, Naomi (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Stephane (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Emmie (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Leo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Katagai, Naomi; Trawalter, Stephane; Trawalter, Emmie; Trawalter, Leo. Refers to: Churgil Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust; Lalita S Rho as Trustee of the Rho Family Trust Filed By: Katagai, Naomi (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Stephane (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Emmie (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Leo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (for Leo Trawalter ORDER SIGNED ON 09/08/2020) filed by Tilley, James. Refers to: Trawalter, Leo Filed By: Tilley, James (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (for Emmie Trawalter ORDER SIGNED 09/08/2020) filed by Tilley, James. Refers to: Trawalter, Emmie Filed By: Tilley, James (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Katagai, Naomi; Trawalter, Stephane; Trawalter, Emmie; Trawalter, Leo. Filed By: Katagai, Naomi (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Stephane (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Emmie (Plaintiff); Trawalter, Leo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Anthony D