This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 09:02:33 (UTC).

Karma Capital Inc vs Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Karma Capital Inc filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Eddie C Sturgeon and Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Eddie C Sturgeon

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gates, Marcus

Gates, Trisha

Karma Capital Inc

Defendants

United Business Bank

Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC

Mediterranean Cuisine Operating Company LLC

Nakhleh, Elias

Nakhleh, Michael

ROIC Creekside Plaza LLC

Mediterranean Cuisine Franchise Company LLC

Pak, Rick

Mediterranean Cuisine Holding Company LLC

Dill, Greg

Elite Restaurant Group Inc

MUFG UNION BANK N A

FranBizNetwork

Pease, Courtney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIRCH, MARIE

1180 Rosecrans St Ste 104

San Diego, CA 92106

Mirch, Kevin J

Defendant Attorneys

Fusch, Kevin E.

1550 Parkside Drive 250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Praskievicz, Owen M

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SEMERDJIAN CAULEY & EVANS LLP

101 W Broadway Suite 810

San Diego, CA 92101

Howatt, Kimberly D

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

101 W Broadway 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Byer, Jeffrey M

Attorney at SANDLER LASRY LAUBE BYER AND VALDEZ LLP

402 W Broadway Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-3542

Singh, Shane

2020 West El Camino Avenue Suite 700

Sacramento, CA 95833

 

Court Documents

Opposition to Defendant Michael Nakhleh's Motion to Set Aside Default

Opposition - Other (to Motion to Set Aside Default) filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus.

Declaration of Marie Mirch

Declaration - Other (of Marie Mirch) filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus.

SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT MICHAEL NAKHLEH REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Nakhleh, Michael.

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY D. HOWATT

Declaration - Other filed by Nakhleh, Michael.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Nakhleh, Michael.

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE OFFERED WITH PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Objections filed by Nakhleh, Michael.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Nakhleh, Michael.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus. Refers to: Dill, Greg

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 11/12/2021 11:00:00 AM.

Notice of Demurrer, Demurrer and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer of Defendant MUFG Union Bank, N.A to Complaint

Demurrer filed by MUFG UNION BANK N A.

Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Re Meet and Confer

Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by MUFG UNION BANK N A.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (demurrer, declaration) filed by MUFG UNION BANK N A.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/14/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Set Aside Default and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed by FranBizNetwork; Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Order - Other (Granting Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed by FranBizNetwork.

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike set for 1/14/2022 at 11:00 a.m. vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike set for 1/14/2022 at 11:00 a.m. vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike set for 3/18/2022 at 11:00 a.m. vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus. Filed By: Karma Capital Inc (Plaintiff); Gates, Trisha (Plaintiff); Gates, Marcus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 12/10/2021 at 11:00AM before Judge Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 11/12/2021 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition - Other filed by Nakhleh, Michael. Filed By: Nakhleh, Michael (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Trisha; Gates, Marcus. Filed By: Karma Capital Inc (Plaintiff); Gates, Trisha (Plaintiff); Gates, Marcus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Karma Capital Inc; Gates, Marcus; Gates, Trisha. Refers to: Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC; Nakhleh, Elias; Nakhleh, Michael; Elite Restaurant Group Inc; Mediterranean Cuisine Operating Company LLC; Mediterranean Cuisine Holding Company LLC; Mediterranean Cuisine Franchise Company LLC; FranBizNetwork; ROIC Creekside Plaza LLC; Pease, Courtney; United Business Bank; MUFG UNION BANK N A; Dill, Greg; Pak, Rick Filed By: Karma Capital Inc (Plaintiff); Gates, Marcus (Plaintiff); Gates, Trisha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Karma Capital, Inc,; Gates, Marcus; Gates, Trisha. Filed By: Karma Capital, Inc, (Plaintiff); Gates, Marcus (Plaintiff); Gates, Trisha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Karma Capital, Inc,; Gates, Marcus; Gates, Trisha. Filed By: Karma Capital, Inc, (Plaintiff); Gates, Marcus (Plaintiff); Gates, Trisha (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDITERRANEAN CUISINE OPERATING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Karma Capital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED BUSINESS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where ROIC Creekside Plaza LLC is a litigant