Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 07:38:41 (UTC).

Kaplan vs BMW of North America LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Kaplan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kaplan, Paul B

Kaplan, Kim C

Defendant

BMW of North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wirtz, Richard M

Attorney at WIRTZ LAW APC

Defendant Attorney

Oaks, Ashley E.

Attorney at LEHRMAN VILLEGAS CHINERY & DOUGLAS LLP

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint; Demand for jury trial

Answer filed by BMW of North America LLC.

Notice to Adverse Parties re Removal to Federal Court

Notice - Other (Stay) filed by BMW of North America LLC.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Removal) filed by BMW of North America LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kaplan, Kim C; Kaplan, Paul B. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Kaplan, Paul B; Kaplan, Kim C. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kaplan, Paul B; Kaplan, Kim C. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Kaplan, Paul B; Kaplan, Kim C. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Stay) filed by BMW of North America LLC. Filed By: BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Removal) filed by BMW of North America LLC. Filed By: BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by BMW of North America LLC. Filed By: BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Kaplan, Kim C; Kaplan, Paul B. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC Filed By: Kaplan, Kim C (Plaintiff); Kaplan, Paul B (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kaplan, Paul B; Kaplan, Kim C. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC Filed By: Kaplan, Paul B (Plaintiff); Kaplan, Kim C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kaplan, Paul B; Kaplan, Kim C. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC Filed By: Kaplan, Paul B (Plaintiff); Kaplan, Kim C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kaplan, Paul B; Kaplan, Kim C. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC Filed By: Kaplan, Paul B (Plaintiff); Kaplan, Kim C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OAKS ASHLEY E.