This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 08:11:19 (UTC).

Kalajian vs. Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Kalajian filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kalajian, Ashlynn M

Defendants

Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc.; DBA : San Diego Zoo Wildlife Alliance

Zoological Society of San Diego; DBA : San Diego Zoo Wildlife Alliance;ESA : Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kalajian, John M

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN M KALAJIAN

Defendant Attorney

DeLaCruz, Alfred Michael

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego, Inc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Zoological Society of San Diego.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Zoological Society of San Diego. Filed By: Zoological Society of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: Kalajian, Ashlynn M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/01/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: Kalajian, Ashlynn M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: Kalajian, Ashlynn M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kalajian, Ashlynn M. Refers to: Zoological Society of San Diego Filed By: Kalajian, Ashlynn M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Zoological Society of San Diego; DBA : The San Diego Zoo is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELACRUZ ALFRED MICHAEL