This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 03:45:54 (UTC).

Kaiser vsDeutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 Kaiser vsDeutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5 was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kaiser, Michele

Defendants

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5

MTC Servicing Inc; DBA : Trustee Corps

Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cate, Allan

Attorney at CATE LEGAL GROUP

888 Prospect St Suite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

Betpera, Artin

18400 Von Karman Avenue 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Steele, John Christopher

Attorney at STEELE LLP

17272 Red Hill Ave

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

Reply (Opposition & Replies)

Reply filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kaiser, Michele.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Kaiser, Michele.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Kaiser, Michele.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Kaiser, Michele.

Notice - Other

Notice of Continued Hearing filed by Kaiser, Michele.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/02/2022 02:30:00 PM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (OF ARTIN BETPERA) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.

Demurrer (Motions)

Demurrer filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kaiser, Michele.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Kaiser, Michele. Refers to: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5; MTC Servicing Inc

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kaiser, Michele.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Kaiser, Michele. Refers to: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5; MTC Servicing Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/07/2022 01:30:00 PM.

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike - Demurrer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.; Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Defendant); Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Kaiser, Michele.; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by Kaiser, Michele.; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Kaiser, Michele.; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/02/2022 02:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 01/13/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5.; Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Defendant); Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Kaiser, Michele.; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Kaiser, Michele.; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Kaiser, Michele. Refers to: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kaiser, Michele. Refers to: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5; MTC Servicing Inc; Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kaiser, Michele. Refers to: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5; MTC Servicing Inc; Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kaiser, Michele. Refers to: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee of the FBR Securitization Trust 2005 5 Mortgage Backed Notes Series 2005 5; MTC Servicing Inc; Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Filed By: Kaiser, Michele (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cate, Allan