This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 09:15:34 (UTC).

Kadlac vs Talton

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Kadlac filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Talton. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diores, Michelle

Kadlac, Joseph

Defendant

Talton, Leonard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cross, Oleg

5190 Governor Dr Ste 108

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle. Refers to: Talton, Leonard

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle. Refers to: Talton, Leonard

Complaint

Complaint filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle. Refers to: Talton, Leonard

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 12)

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (As Amended)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle.; Filed By: Kadlac, Joseph (Plaintiff); Diores, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Diores, Michelle .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Kadlac, Joseph .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Talton, Leonard .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (As Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 12)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle. Refers to: Talton, Leonard; Filed By: Kadlac, Joseph (Plaintiff); Diores, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle. Refers to: Talton, Leonard; Filed By: Kadlac, Joseph (Plaintiff); Diores, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kadlac, Joseph; Diores, Michelle. Refers to: Talton, Leonard; Filed By: Kadlac, Joseph (Plaintiff); Diores, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less