This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/08/2018 at 02:15:35 (UTC).

Juan Cobas vs. Newport Diversified Inc

Case Summary

On 07/14/2009 Juan Cobas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Newport Diversified Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-EC

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COBAS, JUAN

Defendant

NEWPORT DIVERSIFIED INC; DBA : PARKWAY BOWL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASTERNACK, BARRY A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BARRY PASTERNACK

1230 Columbia Street Ste 930

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

ELLIOTT, KELLY R

Attorney at DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

9325 Sky Park Court Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal (REQEUST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT) submitted by Cobas, Juan rejected on 02/08/2011.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 11/05/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 10/22/2010 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/19/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/09/2010 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/19/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (REQEUST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT) submitted by Cobas, Juan rejected on 02/08/2011. Filed By: Cobas, Juan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cobas, Juan. Filed By: Cobas, Juan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketJoint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Cobas, Juan; Newport Diversified Inc. Filed By: Cobas, Juan (Plaintiff); Newport Diversified Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 11/05/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketCase file location changed to East County Courthouse E-Civil/Small Claims Business Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial continued pursuant to Court's motion to 01/07/2011 at 08:30AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Newport Diversified Inc. Filed By: Newport Diversified Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketTrial Brief filed by Newport Diversified Inc. Filed By: Newport Diversified Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2010
  • DocketThe Civil Jury Trial is scheduled for 07/23/2010 at 08:30 AM before Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/09/2010 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketAnswer filed by Newport Diversified Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed by Cobas, Juan. Refers to: Newport Diversified Inc Filed By: Cobas, Juan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cobas, Juan. Refers to: Newport Diversified Inc Filed By: Cobas, Juan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cobas, Juan. Refers to: Newport Diversified Inc Filed By: Cobas, Juan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORT DIVERSIFIED INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIOTT KELLY