This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 08:01:32 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA vs RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 JPMorgan Chase Bank NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

Defendant

Ramirez, Ramon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wate, Shane T

Po Box C 90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

Defendant Attorney

Cardona Loya II, Octavio

Attorney at GOLDEN & CARDONA LOYA LLP

3130 Bonita Rd #200B

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Declaration Re: Venue

Declaration - Other filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.

Answer

Answer filed by Ramirez, Ramon.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Ramirez, Ramon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-03; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Ramirez, Ramon.; Filed By: Ramirez, Ramon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Ramirez, Ramon.; Filed By: Ramirez, Ramon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ramirez, Ramon.; Filed By: Ramirez, Ramon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.; Filed By: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon; Filed By: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon; Filed By: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon; Filed By: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: Ramirez, Ramon; Filed By: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardona Loya II, Octavio