This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/06/2020 at 07:03:18 (UTC).

JOSEFINA BERNAL vs. JOEL BERNAL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 JOSEFINA BERNAL filed an Other lawsuit against JOEL BERNAL. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERNAL, JOSEFINA

Respondent

BERNAL, JOEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingLocation: S-09; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (TRO) filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 07/21/2020 at 01:30PM in Department S-09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 04/29/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Mail filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S-09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (DVS16487) filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketInterpreter Request (SPANISH) filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 04/29/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by BERNAL, JOSEFINA. Refers to: BERNAL, JOEL Filed By: BERNAL, JOSEFINA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.