This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/07/2018 at 05:38:43 (UTC).

JOSE LUIS LOPEZ vs. Argent Mortgage Co.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2009 JOSE LUIS LOPEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Argent Mortgage Co. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS

LOPEZ, JUANITA

Defendants

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

ARGENT MORTGAGE CO; DBA : CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WHITE, ALAN I

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 04/28/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 04/28/17 - volume 1 of 1

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/26/2009 08:35:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 09/11/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/11/2009 08:35:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/18/2009 08:35:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 09/18/2009 08:35:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 03/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 03/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 04/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 04/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 04/28/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 04/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 04/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 03/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 03/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • Certificate of Service filed by LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS; Lopez, Juanita. Refers to: Argent Mortgage Co Filed By: LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS (Plaintiff); Lopez, Juanita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS; Lopez, Juanita. Refers to: Argent Mortgage Co Filed By: LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS (Plaintiff); Lopez, Juanita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 09/18/2009 08:35:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • Notice of Ruling (MOTION TO DISMISS) filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Filed By: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/26/2009 08:35:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING) filed by LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS; Lopez, Juanita. Filed By: LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS (Plaintiff); Lopez, Juanita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • Demurrer filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Filed By: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 06/26/2009 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS; Lopez, Juanita. Refers to: Argent Mortgage Co; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC Filed By: LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS (Plaintiff); Lopez, Juanita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Original Summons filed by LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS; Lopez, Juanita. Refers to: Argent Mortgage Co; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC Filed By: LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS (Plaintiff); Lopez, Juanita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Complaint filed by LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS; Lopez, Juanita. Refers to: Argent Mortgage Co; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC Filed By: LOPEZ, JOSE LUIS (Plaintiff); Lopez, Juanita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.