This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2022 at 07:12:56 (UTC).

JORDAN vs. CITY OF SAN DIEGO

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 JORDAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SAN DIEGO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORDAN, MICHAEL

Defendants

CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.

CITY OF SAN DIEGO

NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berger, Blake W

Attorney at JUREWITZ

600 B Street 1450

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Zurek, Ronald

Attorney at WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

100 Corson Street 300

Pasadena, CA 91103

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.

Answer

Answer filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.

Demurrer (Motions)

Demurrer (2/24/2023) filed by NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike - Demurrer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer (2/24/2023) filed by NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC.; Filed By: NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.; Filed By: CITY OF SAN DIEGO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.; Filed By: CITY OF SAN DIEGO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by JORDAN, MICHAEL. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; NORTHGATE GONZALEZ, LLC; CAPITAL GROWTH PROPERTIES, INC.; Filed By: JORDAN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less