Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 01:45:21 (UTC).

Jones vs Velocity Investments LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Jones filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Velocity Investments LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jones, Riza

Defendant

Velocity Investments LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Recordon, Stephen G

Rooney, Clinton

 

Court Documents

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge (Granted) filed by Jones, Riza.

Plaintiff Riza Jones' Complaint for Violations of the Fair Debt Buying Practices Act and the Rosenthal Act

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Jones, Riza. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jones, Riza. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Jones, Riza. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Timothy Taylor effective 06/11/2021

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Timothy Taylor effective 06/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (Granted) filed by Jones, Riza. Filed By: Jones, Riza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Jones, Riza. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC Filed By: Jones, Riza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jones, Riza. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC Filed By: Jones, Riza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Jones, Riza. Refers to: Velocity Investments LLC Filed By: Jones, Riza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rooney, Clinton