This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 07:51:34 (UTC).

Jones vs Alpha Mortgage Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Jones filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Alpha Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Casserly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy M. Casserly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jones, Cassandra

Defendant

Alpha Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friedman, Todd M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD M FRIEDMAN PC

Defendant Attorney

Weiss, Robert Peter

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jones, Cassandra. Refers to: Alpha Mortgage Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Jones, Cassandra. Refers to: Alpha Mortgage Corporation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Jones, Cassandra. Refers to: Alpha Mortgage Corporation

Answer

Answer filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Jones, Cassandra.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Jones, Cassandra.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation. Filed By: Alpha Mortgage Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation. Filed By: Alpha Mortgage Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation. Filed By: Alpha Mortgage Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Jones, Cassandra. Filed By: Jones, Cassandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Jones, Cassandra. Filed By: Jones, Cassandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Alpha Mortgage Corporation. Filed By: Alpha Mortgage Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Jones, Cassandra. Refers to: Alpha Mortgage Corporation Filed By: Jones, Cassandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Jones, Cassandra. Refers to: Alpha Mortgage Corporation Filed By: Jones, Cassandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jones, Cassandra. Refers to: Alpha Mortgage Corporation Filed By: Jones, Cassandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS, ROBERT PETER