Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/16/2020 at 06:23:13 (UTC).

Johnson vs Johnson Health Tech North

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Johnson Health Tech North. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnson, Griffin

Johnson, Stephanie

Defendant

Johnson Health Tech North America Inc

Guardian Ad Litem

Johnson, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Casey, David S Jr

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

Zaveri, Deval

402 West Broadway #1950

San Diego, CA 92101

Evans, Jason C

Attorney at CASEY GERRY SCHENK FRANCAVILLA BLATT & PENFIE

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

Blatt, Gayle M

Attorney at CASEY GERRY SCHENK FRANCAVILLA BLATT & PENFIE

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Brown, Jay D

Attorney at FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & BROWN LLP

Heffernan, Kevin N

Attorney at FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & BROWN LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/08/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Johnson Health Tech North America Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Johnson Health Tech North America Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Johnson Health Tech North America Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc; Johnson, Paul

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/04/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/21/2020 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJury demanded by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/08/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Filed By: Johnson, Griffin (Plaintiff); Johnson, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Filed By: Johnson, Griffin (Plaintiff); Johnson, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Johnson Health Tech North America Inc. Filed By: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/08/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc; Johnson, Paul Filed By: Johnson, Griffin (Plaintiff); Johnson, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc Filed By: Johnson, Griffin (Plaintiff); Johnson, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc Filed By: Johnson, Griffin (Plaintiff); Johnson, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Johnson, Griffin; Johnson, Stephanie. Refers to: Johnson Health Tech North America Inc Filed By: Johnson, Griffin (Plaintiff); Johnson, Stephanie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON HEALTH TECH NORTH AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN JAY D. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEFFERNAN KEVIN N. ESQ.