Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 04:29:13 (UTC).

JOHNSON VS CRAGO

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 JOHNSON filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CRAGO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Johnson, Lauren JANETTE

Respondent

Crago, George L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DiRe, Daniel M

Attorney at DONALD R HOLBEN & ASSOCIATES APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-61; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Crago, George L. Filed By: Crago, George L (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 07/28/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/29/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Crago, George L. Filed By: Crago, George L (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Crago, George L. Refers to: Johnson, Lauren Filed By: Crago, George L (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Johnson, Lauren JANETTE. Refers to: Crago, George Filed By: Johnson, Lauren JANETTE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Johnson, Lauren JANETTE. Refers to: Crago, George Filed By: Johnson, Lauren JANETTE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Lauren JANETTE. Refers to: Crago, George Filed By: Johnson, Lauren JANETTE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Johnson, Lauren JANETTE. Filed By: Johnson, Lauren JANETTE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Johnson, Lauren JANETTE. Refers to: Crago, George Filed By: Johnson, Lauren JANETTE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DiRe, Daniel M