Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 08:43:12 (UTC).

Johnson vs Bell

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Johnson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bell. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

1439 Neptune Avenue LLC

Johnson, Marcia

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Wannamaker, Roy

Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties

Gleeson, Jeanne

Bell, Mitchell

Epic Real Estate and Management INC

Trustee of Mitcell Lawrence Bell Revocable Trust UTD March 12 2003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aannestad, Anders T

Attorney at AANNESTAD ANDELIN & CORN LLP

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Schonfeld, Alan H

Attorney at SCHONFELD LAW APC

Obrand, Jesse D

Olson, Gregory

 

Court Documents

Answer to Wannamaker, Epic Cross-comlaint

Answer filed by Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC.

Cross-Complaint v. Wannamaker, Epic

Cross-Complaint filed by Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC. Refers to: Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC

Stipulation, Proposed Order to File Verified Answer

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC; 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC; Johnson, Marcia; Bell, Mitchell; Trustee of Mitcell Lawrence Bell Revocable Trust UTD March 12 2003.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Bell

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC; Johnson, Marcia. Refers to: Bell, Mitchell

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - BHHS

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC; Johnson, Marcia. Refers to: Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy. Refers to: Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC

Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations

Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/25/2021) filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Alan H Schonfeld 6/25/2021) filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (6/25/2021) filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy.

Verified Complaint

Complaint filed by Johnson, Marcia; 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC. Refers to: Bell, Mitchell; Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Johnson, Marcia; 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC. Refers to: Bell, Mitchell; Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike - Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC; 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC; Johnson, Marcia; Bell, Mitchell; Trustee of Mitcell Lawrence Bell Revocable Trust UTD March 12 2003. Filed By: Gleeson, Jeanne (Defendant); Pickford Real Estate , INC (Defendant); 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC (Plaintiff); Johnson, Marcia (Plaintiff); Bell, Mitchell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC. Filed By: Gleeson, Jeanne (Cross - Defendant); Pickford Real Estate , INC (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC. Refers to: Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC Filed By: Gleeson, Jeanne (Cross - Complainant); Pickford Real Estate , INC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Bell, Mitchell; Trustee of Mitcell Lawrence Bell Revocable Trust UTD March 12 2003. Filed By: Bell, Mitchell (Defendant); Trustee of Mitcell Lawrence Bell Revocable Trust UTD March 12 2003 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy. Refers to: Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC Filed By: Epic Real Estate and Management INC (Cross - Complainant); Wannamaker, Roy (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer (6/25/2021) filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy. Filed By: Epic Real Estate and Management INC (Defendant); Wannamaker, Roy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/25/2021) filed by Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Wannamaker, Roy. Filed By: Epic Real Estate and Management INC (Defendant); Wannamaker, Roy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC; Johnson, Marcia. Refers to: Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC Filed By: 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC (Plaintiff); Johnson, Marcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC; Johnson, Marcia. Refers to: Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC Filed By: 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC (Plaintiff); Johnson, Marcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Johnson, Marcia; 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC. Refers to: Bell, Mitchell; Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC; Trustee of Mitcell Lawrence Bell Revocable Trust UTD March 12 2003 Filed By: Johnson, Marcia (Plaintiff); 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Marcia; 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC. Refers to: Bell, Mitchell; Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC Filed By: Johnson, Marcia (Plaintiff); 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Johnson, Marcia; 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC. Refers to: Bell, Mitchell; Wannamaker, Roy; Epic Real Estate and Management INC; Gleeson, Jeanne; Pickford Real Estate , INC Filed By: Johnson, Marcia (Plaintiff); 1439 Neptune Avenue LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aannestad, Anders T