This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/06/2022 at 07:07:09 (UTC).

Johnson vs Anthony A Johnson LLC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Anthony A Johnson LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Terry

Defendants

Anthony A Johnson LLC; DBA : Final Mile Deliverables

Barrera Ortiz, Joshua

Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC

Anthony A Johnson LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Tyler

501 W Broadway Unit 1500

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Roman, Reece

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Anthony A Johnson LLC; Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Anthony A Johnson LLC; Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua

Complaint

Complaint filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Anthony A Johnson LLC; Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua

Answer

Answer filed by Anthony A Johnson LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Barrera Ortiz, Joshua

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Anthony A Johnson LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua. Filed By: Anthony A Johnson LLC (Defendant); Barrera Ortiz, Joshua (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC Filed By: Johnson, Terry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Barrera Ortiz, Joshua Filed By: Johnson, Terry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Anthony A Johnson LLC; Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua Filed By: Johnson, Terry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Anthony A Johnson LLC; Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua Filed By: Johnson, Terry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Johnson, Terry. Refers to: Anthony A Johnson LLC; Enterprise Rent A Car Company of Los Angeles LLC; Barrera Ortiz, Joshua Filed By: Johnson, Terry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANTHONY INC. DBA ANTHONY INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant