This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 01:45:07 (UTC).

John Barakat vs Schatzmann

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 John Barakat filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Schatzmann. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership

JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation

BARAKAT, JOHN

JAOUDI, JOSEPH

JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation

SCHATZMANN, LEN

Cross Defendant

LEVIN & DENTINO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fontaine, Justin

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

Reed, Rebecca L

Brizolis, Alex G

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Lieber, Megan K

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to LEVIN & DENTINO INC on Cross-Complaint filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation .

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation. Refers to: LEVIN & DENTINO INC

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/22/2019 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation.

Summons For Cross-Complaint

Original Summons filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation. Refers to: LEVIN & DENTINO INC

Answer

Answer filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation. Refers to: LEVIN & DENTINO INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation; BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation; BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988. Refers to: SCHATZMANN, LEN

Complaint

Complaint filed by JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; BARAKAT, JOHN; COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; BARAKAT, JOHN; COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; BARAKAT, JOHN; COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation. Refers to: LEVIN & DENTINO INC Filed By: SCHATZMANN, LEN (Cross - Complainant); STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default was denied as to LEVIN & DENTINO INC on Cross-Complaint filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/22/2019 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SCHATZMANN, LEN; STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation. Filed By: SCHATZMANN, LEN (Cross - Complainant); STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN. Filed By: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation (Cross - Complainant); SCHATZMANN, LEN (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH. Filed By: BARAKAT, JOHN (Plaintiff); JAOUDI, JOSEPH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation; BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988. Refers to: SCHATZMANN, LEN Filed By: COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership (Plaintiff); JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff); BARAKAT, JOHN (Plaintiff); JAOUDI, JOSEPH (Plaintiff); JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation; BARAKAT, JOHN; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation Filed By: COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership (Plaintiff); JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff); BARAKAT, JOHN (Plaintiff); JAOUDI, JOSEPH (Plaintiff); JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; BARAKAT, JOHN; COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN Filed By: JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988 (Plaintiff); JAOUDI, JOSEPH (Plaintiff); BARAKAT, JOHN (Plaintiff); COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership (Plaintiff); JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; BARAKAT, JOHN; COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN Filed By: JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988 (Plaintiff); JAOUDI, JOSEPH (Plaintiff); BARAKAT, JOHN (Plaintiff); COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership (Plaintiff); JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988; JAOUDI, JOSEPH; BARAKAT, JOHN; COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership; JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation. Refers to: STA ENGINEERING, INC., a California corporation; SCHATZMANN, LEN Filed By: JOSEPH JAOUDI, as trustee of the JAOUDI DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED APRIL 21, 1988 (Plaintiff); JAOUDI, JOSEPH (Plaintiff); BARAKAT, JOHN (Plaintiff); COUNTRY ESTATES, a California General Partnership (Plaintiff); JAOUDI INDUSTRIAL & TRADING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fontaine, Justin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brizolis, Alex G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED, REBECCA L