This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:52:26 (UTC).

Joanne Haeussinger vs. Gloria Maupin

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 Joanne Haeussinger filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gloria Maupin. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAEUSSINGER, JOANNE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MAUPIN, GLORIA

LAREZ, ALEX

DORR, ROBIN R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HACK, PHILLIP L

Attorney at PHILLIP HACK & ASSOCIATES APC

703 Palomar Airport Road Suite 280

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KONOSKE, GREGORY P

Attorney at KONOSKE AKIYAMA & BRUST LLP

16880 W Bernardo Drive 250

San Diego, CA 92127

GIBBS, PATRICK J

Attorney at FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR One World Trade Center

1 World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

ANDERSON, BENJAMIN R

Attorney at BONNIE R MOSS & ASSOCIATES

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 325

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents filed by Larez, Alex.

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Larez, Alex.

Proof of Service of Good Faith Settlement - Certified Mail

Proof of Service filed by Larez, Alex.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents filed by Larez, Alex.

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Larez, Alex.

Proof of Service of Good Faith Settlement - Certified Mail

Proof of Service of Good Faith Settlement - Certified Mail filed by Larez, Alex.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 09/21/2018 at 10:15:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 10/12/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other filed by Haeussinger, Joanne.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Order Continue Trial) filed by Haeussinger, Joanne.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (7/11/18) filed by Haeussinger, Joanne.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/11/2018 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 09/21/2018 10:15:00 AM.

Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report

Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Haeussinger, Joanne.

Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report

Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report (ADDENDUM TO JOINT TRIAL READINESS REPORT) filed by Haeussinger, Joanne.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 09/24/2018 01:30:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Maupin, Gloria.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Frazier,Ronald effective 03/04/2017

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Maupin, Gloria. Filed By: Maupin, Gloria (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Haeussinger, Joanne .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Maupin, Gloria .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Dorr, Robin R .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Maupin, Gloria .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Larez, Alex .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Maupin, Gloria .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Dorr, Robin R .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 09/24/2018 01:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Dorr, Robin R. Filed By: Dorr, Robin R (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Frazier,Ronald effective 03/04/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Frazier, Ronald for 06/23/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in N-29 at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Haeussinger, Joanne. Refers to: Maupin, Gloria; Larez, Alex; Dorr, Robin Filed By: Haeussinger, Joanne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Haeussinger, Joanne. Refers to: Maupin, Gloria; Larez, Alex; Dorr, Robin Filed By: Haeussinger, Joanne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Haeussinger, Joanne. Refers to: Maupin, Gloria; Larez, Alex; Dorr, Robin Filed By: Haeussinger, Joanne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HACK PHILIP L. ESQ.