This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:25:15 (UTC).

Jimenez vs HLT Conrad Domestic LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Jimenez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HLT Conrad Domestic LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimenez, Sergio

Defendants

HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC

HLT Conrad Domestic LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOI, EDWARD W

Defendant Attorneys

Magana, Arcelia N

Black, Dorothy L.

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

 

Court Documents

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

Notice of Related Case (Notices)

Notice of Related Case filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT A

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (AND ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Jimenez, Sergio; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio.

Class and Representative Action Complaint

Complaint filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Class and Representative Action Complaint

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCases consolidated on 05/27/2021. 37-2020-00016193-CU-OE-CTL is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant); HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant); HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant); HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (AND ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Jimenez, Sergio; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff); HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOI, EDWARD W