This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:39:30 (UTC).

Jimenez vs HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Jimenez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimenez, Sergio

Defendants

Fullerton, Josh

HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC

HLT Conrad Domestic LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAGEE, HOWARD L

Lee, David

CHOI, EDWARD W

LEE, LARRY W

Defendant Attorney

Magana, Arcelia N

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh

Complaint

Complaint filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service (Answer) filed by Fullerton, Josh; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Fullerton, Josh; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

Joint Stipulation to Submit to Binding Arbitration

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Submit to binding Arbitration) filed by HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh; Jimenez, Sergio.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Fullerton, Josh; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Submit to binding Arbitration) filed by HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh; Jimenez, Sergio. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant); HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant); Fullerton, Josh (Defendant); Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Fullerton, Josh; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: Fullerton, Josh (Defendant); HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Fullerton, Josh; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: Fullerton, Josh (Defendant); HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Answer) filed by Fullerton, Josh; HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC. Filed By: Fullerton, Josh (Defendant); HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Jimenez, Sergio. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC; HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Fullerton, Josh Filed By: Jimenez, Sergio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, David

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOI, EDWARD W