This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 00:36:41 (UTC).

Jim Pyer Plastering vs JWC Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Jim Pyer Plastering filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JWC Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Casserly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy M. Casserly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jim Pyer Plastering

Defendants

Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc

JWC Construction Inc

Western Alliance Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Freedman, Edward W

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD W FREEDMAN

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc; Western Alliance Bank

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc; Western Alliance Bank

Complaint

Complaint filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc; Western Alliance Bank

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: Western Alliance Bank

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc.

DEFENDANTS JWC CONSTRUCTION, INC. dba JON WAYNE CONSTRUCTION AND CONSULTING and MARINA DEL MAR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer filed by JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 10/02/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc. Filed By: JWC Construction Inc (Defendant); Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc. Filed By: JWC Construction Inc (Defendant); Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Western Alliance Bank.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: Western Alliance Bank Filed By: Jim Pyer Plastering (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc; Western Alliance Bank Filed By: Jim Pyer Plastering (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc; Western Alliance Bank Filed By: Jim Pyer Plastering (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Jim Pyer Plastering. Refers to: JWC Construction Inc; Marina Del Mar Community Association Inc; Western Alliance Bank Filed By: Jim Pyer Plastering (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less