Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 01:35:10 (UTC).

Jeremiah Murphy vs. Kevin Doe

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Jeremiah Murphy filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Kevin Doe. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Murphy, Jeremiah

Respondent

Doe, Kevin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (cancelled service) filed by Murphy, Jeremiah. Refers to: Doe, Kevin Filed By: Murphy, Jeremiah (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to Terminate RO) filed by Murphy, Jeremiah. Refers to: Doe, Kevin Filed By: Murphy, Jeremiah (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Murphy, Jeremiah. Refers to: Doe, Kevin Filed By: Murphy, Jeremiah (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice as to Murphy, Jeremiah .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice as to Doe, Kevin .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Murphy, Jeremiah. Refers to: Doe, Kevin Filed By: Murphy, Jeremiah (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Murphy, Jeremiah. Refers to: Doe, Kevin Filed By: Murphy, Jeremiah (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Murphy, Jeremiah. Refers to: Doe, Kevin Filed By: Murphy, Jeremiah (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less