This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/22/2019 at 00:35:39 (UTC).

JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997 vs Focus Developers & Builders Inc

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997 filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Focus Developers Builders Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOAN M. LEWIS, RONALD F. FRAZIER and Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOAN M. LEWIS

RONALD F. FRAZIER

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED DECEMBER 12 1997

HOUFEK, JEROME

MCKEY, JEAN A

GUTIERREZ, LUIS

PAZ CONSTRUCTION CO

ANLU INVESTMENT INC

JAD BUILDERS INC

XPERA CM INC

Xpera Inc

FOCUS DC INC

XPERA GC INC

Gutierrez, Victor

OCONNOR AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC

AXCEL CONSTRUCTION INC

Paz, Augustin

Schipper, Luis

GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LOCK, DAVID

FOCUS DEVELOPERS & BUILDERS INC

GUTIERREZ, LUIS

PAZ CONSTRUCTION CO

ANLU INVESTMENT INC

JAD BUILDERS INC

XPERA CM INC

Xpera Inc

FOCUS DC INC

XPERA GC INC

Gutierrez, Victor

OCONNOR AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC

Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC

AXCEL CONSTRUCTION INC

Paz, Augustin

Schipper, Luis

GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORPORATION

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Xpera Inc

GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORPORATION

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CRAWLEY, AMANDA K

10200 Willow Creek Rd #150

San Diego, CA 92131

Naumann, William H

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

De Santis, Frank

DeSantis, Kevin V

Attorney at DUNN DESANTIS WALT & KENDRICK LLP

750 B Street Ste 2620

San Diego, CA 92101

Yarbrough, Adam J

LUHRING, SUSAN E

Attorney at MAVREDAKIS CRANERT

800 E Colorado Blvd # 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

Farmer, John T

402 W Broadway Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CRAWLEY, AMANDA K

10200 Willow Creek Rd #150

San Diego, CA 92131

Naumann, William H

De Santis, Frank

DeSantis, Kevin V

Attorney at DUNN DESANTIS WALT & KENDRICK LLP

750 B Street Ste 2620

San Diego, CA 92101

Yarbrough, Adam J

LUHRING, SUSAN E

Attorney at MAVREDAKIS CRANERT

800 E Colorado Blvd # 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

Other Attorneys

MENEKSHE, AYHAN M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/08/2019 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Xpera's Answer to Wanke's Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by Xpera Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by XPERA CM INC; Xpera Inc.

Answer to WICR's cross-complaint

Answer filed by McKey, Jean A; JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997; Houfek, Jerome.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by McKey, Jean A; JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997; Houfek, Jerome.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Xpera CM Inc and XperaGC Inc on the Cross Complaint filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential ONLY) filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC.

Disassociation of Attorney

Disassociation of Attorney filed by GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORPORATION.

Defendant Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint

Answer filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC.

Summons to Cross-Complaint

Original Summons filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC. Refers to: Gutierrez, Victor; Gutierrez, Luis; Schipper, Luis; Houfek, Jerome; McKey, Jean; Paz, Augustin; Xpera Inc; JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997; Focus Developers & Builders Inc; FOCUS DC INC; OCONNOR AND SONS CONSTRUCTION INC; AXCEL CONSTRUCTION INC; XPERA GC INC; XPERA CM INC; JAD BUILDERS INC; ANLU INVESTMENT INC; PAZ CONSTRUCTION CO; GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORPORATION; Griffin Dewatering Corp

Answer to Cross Complainant Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc's Cross-Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by ANLU INVESTMENT INC; FOCUS DC INC; Focus Developers & Builders Inc; Gutierrez, Luis.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by ANLU INVESTMENT INC; FOCUS DC INC; Focus Developers & Builders Inc; Gutierrez, Luis.

Answer To Cross-Complainant Griffin Dewatering Corporation's Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by Focus Developers & Builders Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Focus Developers & Builders Inc.

ANSWER OF GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORP. TO WANKE INDUSTRIAL CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Griffin Dewatering Corp.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Gutierrez, Luis. Filed By: Gutierrez, Luis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Gutierrez, Luis. Filed By: Gutierrez, Luis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC. Filed By: Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential INC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/08/2019 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 12/20/2019 at 02:00PM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by XPERA CM INC; Xpera Inc. Filed By: XPERA CM INC (Cross - Defendant); Xpera Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Xpera Inc. Filed By: Xpera Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to XPERA GC INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to XPERA CM INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, deems this case as 'exceptional' and orders the case exempt from the case disposition time goals and a case progression plan is set forth, with the goal of disposing the case within 3 years. Additionally, case is ordered a Mandatory eFile Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Frazier, Ronald for 05/17/2019 at 11:15:00 AM in C-65 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2019 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997; Houfek, Jerome; McKey, Jean A. Refers to: Focus Developers & Builders Inc; Lock, David; Gutierrez, Luis Filed By: JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997 (Plaintiff); Houfek, Jerome (Plaintiff); McKey, Jean A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997; Houfek, Jerome; McKey, Jean A. Refers to: Focus Developers & Builders Inc; Lock, David; Gutierrez, Luis Filed By: JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997 (Plaintiff); Houfek, Jerome (Plaintiff); McKey, Jean A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997; Houfek, Jerome; McKey, Jean A. Refers to: Focus Developers & Builders Inc; Lock, David; Gutierrez, Luis Filed By: JEAN A MCKEY BENEFICIARY UNDER THE JEAN A MCKEY REVOCABLE TRUST dated December 12 1997 (Plaintiff); Houfek, Jerome (Plaintiff); McKey, Jean A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Xpera Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where JEAN A HOFFERBERTH TRUSTOR AND/OR TRUSTEE OF THE HOFFERBERTH FAMILY TRUST DATED THE 29 DAY OF MARCH 2007 is a litigant

Latest cases where Axcel Construction Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Griffin Dewatering, LLC is a litigant