This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 12:00:47 (UTC).

JANE ROE 117 vs DOE 1 DIOCESE

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 JANE ROE 117 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1 DIOCESE. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine Bacal and Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Katherine Bacal

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANE ROE 117

Defendant

DOE 1 DIOCESE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carney, Michael W

Attorney at SLATER SLATER SCHULMAN LLP

8124 W 3Rd St #1St

Los Angeles, CA 90048

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE

Notice of Related Case (Notices)

Notice of Related Case filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte) (Ex Parte)

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (1 FINDINGS ON CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AUTHORIZING SERVICE AND 2 AN ORDER TO SEAL) filed by JANE ROE 117.

Notice of Lodgment (Notices) (Notices)

Notice of Lodgment filed by JANE ROE 117.

Proposed Order (Motions) (Motions)

Proposed Order submitted by JANE ROE 117 received but not filed on 06/20/2022.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte) (Ex Parte)

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (FO1 FINDINGS ON CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACT, AUTHORIZING LEAVE TO AMEND AND 2 AN ORDER TO SEAL AND KEEP CONFIDENTIAL CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACT) filed by JANE ROE 117.

Notice of Lodgment (Notices) (Notices)

Notice of Lodgment filed by JANE ROE 117.

Proposed Order (Motions) (Motions)

Proposed Order submitted by JANE ROE 117 received but not filed on 06/20/2022.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for an In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit) filed by JANE ROE 117.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for an In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit) filed by JANE ROE 117.; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase was reassigned to Eddie C Sturgeon for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by JANE ROE 117 received but not filed on 06/20/2022.; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by JANE ROE 117.; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (FO1 FINDINGS ON CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACT, AUTHORIZING LEAVE TO AMEND AND 2 AN ORDER TO SEAL AND KEEP CONFIDENTIAL CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACT) filed by JANE ROE 117.; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by JANE ROE 117 received but not filed on 06/20/2022.; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by JANE ROE 117.; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (1 FINDINGS ON CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AUTHORIZING SERVICE AND 2 AN ORDER TO SEAL) filed by JANE ROE 117.; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by JANE ROE 117. Refers to: DOE 1 DIOCESE; Filed By: JANE ROE 117 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carney, Michael W