This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 07:13:36 (UTC).

Jamil vs Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Jamil filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamil, Marsil Basil

Defendants

Autoliv Asp Inc

Autoliv Gmbh

Autoliv Safety Technology Inc

BMW of North America LLC

Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW

Conti Temic Microelectronic Gmbh

Continental AG

Continental Automotive Systems Inc

Robert Bosch Gmbh Bosch

Robert Bosch LLC

Sunroad Auto LLC; DBA : BMW of El Cajon

Zf Friederichshafen Ag

Zf Trw Automotive Inc

Sunroad BCV Auto Inc; DBA : BMW of El Cajon;ESA : Sunroad Auto LLC;DBA : BMW of El Cajon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Faraj, Haytham

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF HAYTHAM FARAJ

Defendant Attorney

Harrison, Harry W

 

Court Documents

Declaration - HARRY W. HARRISON RE MEET AND CONFER

Declaration - Other (of Harry W Harrison re: Inability to Comply with Meet and Confer) filed by Sunroad BCV Auto Inc.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Sunroad Auto LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW; BMW of North America LLC; Sunroad Auto LLC; Continental AG; Continental Automotive Systems Inc; Conti Temic Microelectronic Gmbh; Robert Bosch Gmbh Bosch; Robert Bosch LLC; Zf Trw Automotive Inc; Zf Friederichshafen Ag; Autoliv Asp Inc; Autoliv Safety Technology Inc; Autoliv Gmbh

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW; BMW of North America LLC; Sunroad Auto LLC; Continental AG; Continental Automotive Systems Inc; Conti Temic Microelectronic Gmbh; Robert Bosch Gmbh Bosch; Robert Bosch LLC; Zf Trw Automotive Inc; Zf Friederichshafen Ag; Autoliv Asp Inc; Autoliv Safety Technology Inc; Autoliv Gmbh

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW; BMW of North America LLC; Sunroad Auto LLC; Continental AG; Continental Automotive Systems Inc; Conti Temic Microelectronic Gmbh; Robert Bosch Gmbh Bosch; Robert Bosch LLC; Zf Trw Automotive Inc; Zf Friederichshafen Ag; Autoliv Asp Inc; Autoliv Safety Technology Inc; Autoliv Gmbh

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Harry W Harrison re: Inability to Comply with Meet and Confer) filed by Sunroad BCV Auto Inc. Filed By: Sunroad BCV Auto Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Sunroad BCV Auto Inc Filed By: Jamil, Marsil Basil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW; BMW of North America LLC; Sunroad BCV Auto Inc; Continental AG; Continental Automotive Systems Inc; Conti Temic Microelectronic Gmbh; Robert Bosch Gmbh Bosch; Robert Bosch LLC; Zf Trw Automotive Inc; Zf Friederichshafen Ag; Autoliv Asp Inc; Autoliv Safety Technology Inc; Autoliv Gmbh Filed By: Jamil, Marsil Basil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW; BMW of North America LLC; Sunroad BCV Auto Inc; Continental AG; Continental Automotive Systems Inc; Conti Temic Microelectronic Gmbh; Robert Bosch Gmbh Bosch; Robert Bosch LLC; Zf Trw Automotive Inc; Zf Friederichshafen Ag; Autoliv Asp Inc; Autoliv Safety Technology Inc; Autoliv Gmbh Filed By: Jamil, Marsil Basil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Jamil, Marsil Basil. Refers to: Bayerische Motoren Werke Ag BMW; BMW of North America LLC; Sunroad BCV Auto Inc; Continental AG; Continental Automotive Systems Inc; Conti Temic Microelectronic Gmbh; Robert Bosch Gmbh Bosch; Robert Bosch LLC; Zf Trw Automotive Inc; Zf Friederichshafen Ag; Autoliv Asp Inc; Autoliv Safety Technology Inc; Autoliv Gmbh Filed By: Jamil, Marsil Basil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunroad Auto LLC; AKA : Kearny Mesa Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOLIV SAFERY TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOLIV ASP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant