This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2018 at 09:43:03 (UTC).

James Matthew Wood vs All Phase Restoration

Case Summary

On 12/14/2015 James Matthew Wood filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against All Phase Restoration. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE BACAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE BACAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOOD, JAMES MATTHEW

Defendant

ALL PHASE RESTORATION; DBA : SERVICE MASTER ALL PHASE RESTORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'LEARY, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at SKILLING O LEARY PC

550 W C Street 1950

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

GRAVES, DAVID W

Attorney at LATURNO & GRAVES

613 West Valley Parkway 225

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Wood, James Matthew.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Wood, James Matthew.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Wood, James Matthew.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/05/2016 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

Mediation Selection Form

Mediation Selection Form filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 03/30/2017 at 10:30:00 AM in C-69 before at Central.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by ROBERTS, MICHAEL J.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Wood, James Matthew. Refers to: ALL PHASE RESTORATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wood, James Matthew. Refers to: ALL PHASE RESTORATION

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wood, James Matthew. Refers to: ALL PHASE RESTORATION

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Answer

Answer filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial set for 4/21/2017 at 8:40AM vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) set for 3/30/2017 at 10:30AM vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Settled at hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by ROBERTS, MICHAEL J. Filed By: ROBERTS, MICHAEL J (Mediator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/30/2017 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 03/30/2017 at 10:30:00 AM in C-69 before at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation Selection Form filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION. Filed By: ALL PHASE RESTORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (ALL PHASE RESTORATION) filed by Wood, James Matthew. Refers to: ALL PHASE RESTORATION Filed By: Wood, James Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION. Filed By: ALL PHASE RESTORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by ALL PHASE RESTORATION. Filed By: ALL PHASE RESTORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Wood, James Matthew. Refers to: ALL PHASE RESTORATION Filed By: Wood, James Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wood, James Matthew. Refers to: ALL PHASE RESTORATION Filed By: Wood, James Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Wood, James Matthew. Refers to: ALL PHASE RESTORATION Filed By: Wood, James Matthew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Service Master Restoration & Cleaning by Integrity Pacific Building Maintence Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graves, David William